ME LD1978 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Home Ownership by Reducing Education Debt
Title
An Act To Promote Home Ownership by Reducing Education Debt
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #476 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #623 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #623 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-437). |
2022-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-437) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 476 (Yeas 73 - Nays 62 - Absent 13 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-437) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-437) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 623 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-02-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Curry of Waldo REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Reported by Senator CURRY of Waldo for the Joint Standing Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business pursuant to Resolve 2021, chapter 64, section 2. |