ME LD1976 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Convene a Study Group To Examine Bridge Safety
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Convene a Study Group To Examine Bridge Safety
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Resolve and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Resolve and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |