ME LD1946 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Establishing the Committee To Ensure Constitutionally Adequate Contact with Counsel
Title
Resolve, Establishing the Committee To Ensure Constitutionally Adequate Contact with Counsel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-975), in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-975) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-975). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-11 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-03-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2022-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |