ME LD194 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit Contributions, Expenditures and Participation by Foreign Government-owned Entities To Influence Referenda

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prohibit Contributions, Expenditures and Participation by Foreign Government-owned Entities To Influence Referenda

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #462 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #347 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - House - Passage To Be Engrossed RC #253 (Y: 87 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #209 (Y: 76 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-02SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-07-02SenateRELEASED.
2021-06-30SenateHELD at the Request of Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin.
2021-06-30SenateLD 194 In Senate, June 30, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 and 12, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
2021-06-16SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2021-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-15HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-15SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 347 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-125) AND House Amendment "A" (H-581) in concurrence
2021-06-14HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-14HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2021-06-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 253 (Yeas 87 - Nays 54 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
2021-06-14HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-125). and House Amendment "A" (H-581)
2021-06-14HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-581) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative GROHOSKI of Ellsworth, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2021-06-14HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-10HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
2021-06-09HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-06-09HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-125).
2021-06-09HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2021-06-09HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-125) was READ and ADOPTED.
2021-06-09HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2021-06-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 209 (Yeas 76 - Nays 55 - Absent 20 - Excused 0)
2021-06-09HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-06-09HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2021-06-08HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseUnfinished Business
2021-06-03HouseLater today assigned.
2021-06-03HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-03HouseRepresentative CAIAZZO of Scarborough moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2021-06-03HouseReports READ.
2021-06-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2021-06-02SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-125)
2021-06-02SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-125) READ and ADOPTED
2021-06-02SenateREAD ONCE
2021-06-02SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2021-06-02SenateReports READ
2021-05-27JointReported Out: ONTP-AM/ONTP
2021-04-16JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-04-16JointWork Session Held
2021-04-09JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-26JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2021-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on January 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=194&snum=130
Texthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0082&item=1&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0082&item=2&snum=130
Amendmenthttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0082&item=5&snum=130
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN019402.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/bills_130th/fiscalpdfs/FN019405.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078256&chamber=House&serialnumber=209
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078256&chamber=House&serialnumber=253
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078256&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=347
Roll Callhttps://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280078256&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=462

Bill Comments

feedback