ME LD1939 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-06 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Amend the Membership of the Maine-Canadian Legislative Advisory Commission and the New England and Eastern Canada Legislative Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Amend the Membership of the Maine-Canadian Legislative Advisory Commission and the New England and Eastern Canada Legislative Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-06SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
2023-07-06SenateOn motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE
2023-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2023-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-14HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2023-06-12HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-285).
2023-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-285).
2023-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-285) READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-12SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-06-12SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2023-06-12JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-05-25JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-05-25JointWork Session Held
2023-05-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
2023-05-16SenateCommittee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback