ME LD1931 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Require Background Investigations for Certain Individuals To Receive Federal Tax Information in Accordance with Federal Standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Require Background Investigations for Certain Individuals To Receive Federal Tax Information in Accordance with Federal Standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2020-03-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-03-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2020-03-17HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2020-03-12SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence
2020-03-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2020-03-10SenateUnfinished Business
2020-03-05SenateUnfinished Business
2020-03-03SenateUnfinished Business
2020-02-27SenateUnfinished Business
2020-02-25SenateUnfinished Business
2020-02-20SenateUnfinished Business
2020-02-20SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2020-02-18SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2020-02-18SenateREAD ONCE
2020-02-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2020-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2020-02-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2020-02-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2020-01-08SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2020-01-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-01-08HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2020-01-08HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback