ME LD1929 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Assistance to Areas Severely Infested with Browntail Moths
Title
An Act To Provide Assistance to Areas Severely Infested with Browntail Moths
Sponsors
Rep. Allison Hepler [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] | Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Sean Paulhus [D] | Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-636) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-636) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-636) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-636) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-436) was ADOPTED AND to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-436) thereto. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-436) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-436) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BLACK of Franklin Senate Amendment "A" (S-436) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-772) READ |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2022-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-772). |
2022-02-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-02-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-02-18 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-18 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2022-01-18 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 18, 2022. |