ME LD1927 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Erect and Maintain Markers To Commemorate and Recognize the Lafayette Trail
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Transportation To Erect and Maintain Markers To Commemorate and Recognize the Lafayette Trail
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Deschambault [D] | Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Sen. Nathan Libby [D] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2020-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2020-03-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-17 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-427). |
2020-03-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-03-17 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-427) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-03-17 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2020-03-17 | House | On motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-03-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-427) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-427) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 2, 2020 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |