ME LD1906 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Enable Confirmatory Adoption

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Enable Confirmatory Adoption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-21HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-21HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-602) in concurrence
2023-06-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-602) READ and ADOPTED
2023-06-21SenateREAD ONCE
2023-06-21SenateOn motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2023-06-21SenateReports READ
2023-06-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-20HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-602).
2023-06-20HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2023-06-20HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-602) was READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-20HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2023-06-20HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2023-06-20HouseReports READ.
2023-06-20JointReported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
2023-05-30JointVoted: Divided Report
2023-05-30JointWork Session Held
2023-05-23JointWork Session Held: TABLED
2023-05-09SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2023-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-05-09HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2023-05-09HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback