ME LD1900 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Name Changes
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Name Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Sheehan [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D] | Rep. Barbara Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #632 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #472 (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #472 (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-807) in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-807) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 632 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-807). |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-807) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 472 (Yeas 78 - Nays 56 - Absent 14 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |