ME LD1896 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Thermal Renewable Energy Credits
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Thermal Renewable Energy Credits
Sponsors
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] |
Rep. Christina Riley [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #346 (Y: 78 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #347 (Y: 78 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #347 (Y: 78 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-384). |
2020-02-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-384) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2020-02-18 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2020-02-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 346 (Yeas 78 - Nays 45 - Absent 25 - Excused 1) - Vacant 2 |
2020-02-18 | House | On motion of Representative RILEY of Jay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-384) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-384) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-02-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-12-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2019 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |