ME LD1890 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Streamline the Management of Maine's Transportation Infrastructure by Initiating the Process of Terminating the Maine Turnpike Authority
Title
An Act To Streamline the Management of Maine's Transportation Infrastructure by Initiating the Process of Terminating the Maine Turnpike Authority
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #638 (Y: 83 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 638 (Yeas 83 - Nays 65 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-18 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2018-04-18 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-28 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed. |