ME LD1886 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Repeal the Law Regarding the County Jail Reimbursement Fee
Title
An Act To Repeal the Law Regarding the County Jail Reimbursement Fee
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Sen. David Miramant [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #631 (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #469 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #469 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 631 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 469 (Yeas 78 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-03-22 | House | On motion of Representative LOOKNER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |