ME LD1885 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Maine's Veterinary Workforce
Title
An Act To Increase Maine's Veterinary Workforce
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Fay [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D] | Rep. Lydia Crafts [D] |
Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] | Rep. David McCrea [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-631) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-631) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-631) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-631) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-963), in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-963) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-963). |
2022-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-15 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-15 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-08 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Curry of Waldo, REFERRED to the Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business, in concurrence. |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |