ME LD1884 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Dual Liquor Licenses
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing Dual Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2020-02-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-06 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-664), in concurrence. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-664) READ and ADOPTED |
2020-01-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-01-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-664). |
2020-01-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-01-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-12-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2019-12-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019. |