ME LD1878 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Create the Council to Transition Long Creek Youth Development Center
Title
Resolve, to Create the Council to Transition Long Creek Youth Development Center
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Grayson Lookner [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Rep. Nina Milliken [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-04 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2023-05-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-03 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1878&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1203&item=1&snum=131 |