ME LD1877 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Prior Authorization Requirements and Step Therapy Protocols for Medications Addressing Serious Mental Illness for MaineCare Recipients
Title
An Act To Prohibit Prior Authorization Requirements and Step Therapy Protocols for Medications Addressing Serious Mental Illness for MaineCare Recipients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #491 (Y: 76 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-868) thereto in concurrence |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-868) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-868) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) READ |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-868) thereto. |
2022-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-868) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, House Amendment "A" (H-868) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-848) was READ. |
2022-03-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 491 (Yeas 76 - Nays 59 - Absent 12 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |