ME LD1875 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Naming of Bridges and Designating Bridge 5818 as the Specialist Wade A. Slack Memorial Bridge
Title
An Act Regarding the Naming of Bridges and Designating Bridge 5818 as the Specialist Wade A. Slack Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce White [D] | Rep. Richard Bradstreet [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D] | Rep. Michael Perkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2020-02-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2020-02-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2020-02-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2020-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-12-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2019-12-24 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019. |