ME LD1874 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Ensure the Continued Provision of Services to Maine Children and Families
Title
Resolve, To Ensure the Continued Provision of Services to Maine Children and Families
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #668 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #649 (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #593 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #607 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #649 (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #593 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #607 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | in concurrence |
2018-05-02 | Senate | LD 1874 In Senate, May 2, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-05-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-05-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 649V 141 having voted in the affirmative and 7 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-05-02 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 593 (Yeas 139 - Nays 5 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-12 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-12 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 607 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-738). |
2018-04-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-738) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-10 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |