ME LD1872 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create a Task Force Relating to the Water Quality of Saco Bay
Title
Resolve, To Create a Task Force Relating to the Water Quality of Saco Bay
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Copeland [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] |
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-01-31 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2022-01-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2022-01-05 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1872&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1382&item=1&snum=130 |