ME LD1872 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 12: Licensure of Manufacturers and Wholesalers, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Maine Board of Pharmacy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 12: Licensure of Manufacturers and Wholesalers, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Maine Board of Pharmacy

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateFINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2020-02-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-25HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2020-02-25HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2020-02-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith
2020-02-20SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
2020-02-20SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2020-02-18SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2020-02-18SenateREAD ONCE
2020-02-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2020-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-13HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2020-02-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2020-02-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-12-24HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed.
2019-12-24HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2019.
2019-12-24HouseReported by Representative TEPLER for the Department of Professional and Financial Regulation, Maine Board of Pharmacy pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072.

Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback