ME LD1871 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Modify the Financial Disclosure Requirements for a Governor-elect

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Modify the Financial Disclosure Requirements for a Governor-elect

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2020-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2020-02-11HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-376).
2020-02-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2020-02-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-376) was READ and ADOPTED.
2020-02-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2020-02-11HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2020-02-11HouseReports READ.
2020-02-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2020-02-06SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-376)
2020-02-06SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2020-02-04SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2020-02-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-376) READ and ADOPTED
2020-02-04SenateREAD ONCE
2020-02-04SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-376) Report ACCEPTED
2020-02-04SenateReport READ
2020-01-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2019 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback