ME LD1863 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Bars with an Occupancy of 30 or Fewer Persons To Have Only One Bathroom
Title
An Act To Allow Bars with an Occupancy of 30 or Fewer Persons To Have Only One Bathroom
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1863&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0662&item=1&snum=130 |