ME LD1860 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Maine's Suicide and Opioid Crises through the Construction of Affordable Recovery Facilities in Underserved Areas of the State
Title
An Act To Address Maine's Suicide and Opioid Crises through the Construction of Affordable Recovery Facilities in Underserved Areas of the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-03-11 | Joint | Reported Out: LTW |
2022-03-10 | Joint | LTW Approved by Chairs |
2022-01-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1860&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0652&item=1&snum=130 |