ME LD1858 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Delegating Authority for Services Performed by Emergency Medical Services Personnel in Health Care Facilities
Title
An Act Regarding Delegating Authority for Services Performed by Emergency Medical Services Personnel in Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-478). |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-31 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-478). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-478) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2022-01-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |