ME LD1856 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Permits for Burial of Cremated Remains
Title
An Act Regarding Permits for Burial of Cremated Remains
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |