ME LD1855 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Fund the Reorganization of the Department of Public Safety, State Bureau of Identification
Title
An Act To Fund the Reorganization of the Department of Public Safety, State Bureau of Identification
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2018-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-658), in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-658) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-658). |
2018-03-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |