ME LD1854 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Finance Authority of Maine Act To Allow for Remote Meetings
Title
An Act To Amend the Finance Authority of Maine Act To Allow for Remote Meetings
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Curry [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #501 (Y: 115 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 501 (Yeas 115 - Nays 17 - Absent 15 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4) |
2022-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2022-03-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-23 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-03-02 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |