ME LD1845 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Incentives To Attract Trained Firefighters to Maine and To Retain Trained Firefighters by Expanding the Provision of Live Fire Service Training
Title
An Act To Provide Incentives To Attract Trained Firefighters to Maine and To Retain Trained Firefighters by Expanding the Provision of Live Fire Service Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - Enactment RC #563 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-525) thereto. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-525) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-525) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-525) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) was ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-04 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 563 (Yeas 145 - Nays 0 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-04 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-04-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-04-03 | House | On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-695), in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-695) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-695). |
2018-03-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-29 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-03-01 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |