ME LD1843 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow the Secretary of State To Use an Electronic Lien Titling Program for the Purposes of the Maine Motor Vehicle Certificate of Title and Antitheft Act
Title
An Act To Allow the Secretary of State To Use an Electronic Lien Titling Program for the Purposes of the Maine Motor Vehicle Certificate of Title and Antitheft Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Perkins [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Rep. Dustin White [R] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-798), in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-798) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-798). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-12-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-20 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 20, 2021. |