ME LD1842 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on June 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to the Computation of Benefits for Correctional Officers in the 1998 Special Retirement Plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating to the Computation of Benefits for Correctional Officers in the 1998 Special Retirement Plan

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp Rpt RC #305 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-18SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-17HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-06-17HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-17HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-17HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority OTP Pursuant to Joint Order 2019, S.P. 584 Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-17HouseReports READ.
2019-06-14SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2019-06-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
2019-06-14SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-14SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 305 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-14SenateReports READ

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback