ME LD1835 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Transfer Funds within the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife
Title
An Act To Transfer Funds within the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-06-21 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-06-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-06-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-647) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-518). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-647) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-518) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-518) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-647) |
2018-06-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-647), in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-647) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-647). |
2018-03-20 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-20 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence |
2018-02-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |