ME LD1834 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Ongoing Monitoring of Maine's Child Protective Services
Title
An Act To Establish Ongoing Monitoring of Maine's Child Protective Services
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Sen. Richard Bennett [R] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] |
Sen. Nathan Libby [D] | Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D] | Rep. Sawin Millett [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-03-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 20, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1834&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0651&item=1&snum=130 |