ME LD1820 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Expand Access to Good Jobs with Better Career and Technical Education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Expand Access to Good Jobs with Better Career and Technical Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-18SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-05-12JointReported Out: ONTP
2023-05-10JointVoted: ONTP
2023-05-10JointWork Session Held
2023-04-27HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-04-27HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2023-04-27SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback