ME LD1818 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Port Facilities Relating to Offshore Wind Power Projects
Title
An Act Regarding Port Facilities Relating to Offshore Wind Power Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2023-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1818&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0733&item=1&snum=131 |