ME LD1816 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Promote Labor Education through the University of Maine System
Title
An Act To Promote Labor Education through the University of Maine System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #803 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #561 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #450 (Y: 79 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #561 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #450 (Y: 79 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-628). |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 803 Yeas 18 - Nays 11 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-628) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-628) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) was ADOPTED AND to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) in concurrence |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-02-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 561 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-763). |
2022-02-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-763) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-02-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-02-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 450 (Yeas 79 - Nays 56 - Absent 13 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3) |
2022-02-16 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-02-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-01-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-12-15 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 15, 2021. |