ME LD1815 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Improve Multimodal Facilities, Highways and Bridges and Municipal Culverts
Title
An Act To Authorize a General Fund Bond Issue To Improve Multimodal Facilities, Highways and Bridges and Municipal Culverts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-09 - House - Enactment - Bond Issue RC #739 (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Present Required, in concurrence. |
2018-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 739 (Yeas 128 - Nays 0 - Absent 23 - Excused 0) |
2018-07-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-07-09 | House | This being a Bond Authorization Act, in accordance with the provisions of Section 14 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present was necessary. |
2018-07-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-07-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-531). |
2018-07-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-07-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-531). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-531) READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-05-02 | House | Carried over to the next special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-02-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-01 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |