ME LD1811 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 414 32 Yeas - 3 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 414 32 Yeas - 3 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Medical Marijuana Act
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 414 32 Yeas - 3 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-519) thereto | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-519) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-519) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On motion by Senator COURTNEY of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-519) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-519) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) | |
2010-04-06 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 352 (Yeas 128 - Nays 17 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) | |
2010-04-05 | (H) This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) | |
2010-04-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-04-02 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2010-04-02 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) Report ACCEPTED | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-04-02 | (S) On motion by Senator NASS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-508) Report | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Report READ | |
2010-03-04 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) On motion by Senator Brannigan of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |