ME LD181 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Funding to the Department of Health and Human Services To Support Free Health Clinics in the State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Funding to the Department of Health and Human Services To Support Free Health Clinics in the State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - Recede And Concur RC #33 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Recede And Concur RC #33 (Y: 75 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #30 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #24 (Y: 79 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-04-16SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-04-04HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-04HouseROLL CALL NO. 33 (Yeas 76 - Nays 63 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-04-04HouseOn motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-11).
2019-04-02SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-04-02SenateREAD A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-11) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-04-02SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2019-03-28SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-11) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-03-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-03-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 30 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-03-28SenateReports Read
2019-03-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-26HouseROLL CALL NO. 24 (Yeas 79 - Nays 61 - Absent 9 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-03-26HouseSubsequently, on motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-03-26HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-03-21HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-19HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-14HouseUnfinished Business
2019-03-14HouseLater today assigned.
2019-03-14HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2019-03-14HouseReports READ.
2019-01-17SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2019-01-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-17HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-01-17HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback