ME LD1808 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations Resulting from a State Government Evaluation Act Review of the Department of Environmental Protection by the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations Resulting from a State Government Evaluation Act Review of the Department of Environmental Protection by the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2018-04-09 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-608), in concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608). |
2018-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Saviello of Franklin REFERRED to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2018-01-30 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-30 | House | Representative TUCKER for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 955, subsection 4 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |