ME LD1805 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Increase State Oversight of Election Funding by Requiring Approval by the Legislature
Title
An Act to Increase State Oversight of Election Funding by Requiring Approval by the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #108 (Y: 78 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #193 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #193 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2023-06-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 108 (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 193 Yeas 19 - Nays 11 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |