ME LD1803 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 28: Advanced Deposit Wagering, a Major Substantive Rule of the Gambling Control Board
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Chapter 28: Advanced Deposit Wagering, a Major Substantive Rule of the Gambling Control Board
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-03-27 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2018-03-22 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-03-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-03-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2018-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative LUCHINI for the Gambling Control Board pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |