ME LD1800 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 29, Allowances for Support Services for Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 101: MaineCare Benefits Manual, Chapter III, Section 29, Allowances for Support Services for Adults with Intellectual Disabilities or Autism Spectrum Disorder, a Major Substantive Rule of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-02-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-02-22 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2018-02-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2018-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |