ME LD1799 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 308: Standards of Conduct for Transmission and Distribution Utilities and Affiliated Generators, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Title
Resolve, Regarding Legislative Review of Portions of Chapter 308: Standards of Conduct for Transmission and Distribution Utilities and Affiliated Generators, a Major Substantive Rule of the Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-04 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2018-04-04 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-704), in concurrence. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-02 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-704). |
2018-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-04-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Woodsome of York REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-01-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2018-01-23 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-01-23 | House | Representative BERRY for the Public Utilities Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |