ME LD1798 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Amend the Maine Tax Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend the Maine Tax Laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-17SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) AND House Amendment "A" (H-598) in concurrence
2019-06-17SenateHouse Amendment "A" (H-598) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-17SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-596) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-17SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-17SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2019-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-596) and House Amendment "A" (H-598).
2019-06-14HouseOn motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, House Amendment "A" (H-598) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-596) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-14HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-14HouseThe Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-06-14HouseOn OBJECTION of Representative TIPPING of Orono REMOVED.
2019-06-14HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-05-30SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
2019-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-05-30HouseCommittee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback