ME LD179 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 48 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 48 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Change the Name of Columbus Day to Indigenous Peoples Day
Title
An Act To Change the Name of Columbus Day to Indigenous Peoples Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Enactment RC #48 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #16 (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #16 (Y: 88 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 48 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-04-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report in Concurrence. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report in Concurrence. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-03-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 16 (Yeas 88 - Nays 51 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-03-19 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-17 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |