ME LD1787 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide for the 2018 and 2019 Allocations of the State Ceiling on Private Activity Bonds

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide for the 2018 and 2019 Allocations of the State Ceiling on Private Activity Bonds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2018-03-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-20HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2018-03-15HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-375).
2018-03-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-15HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2018-03-06SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-03-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-375)
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-375) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-06SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-06SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED
2018-01-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-01-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2018-01-16SenateCommittee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback