ME LD1784 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 724 Yeas 28 - Nays 2 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 724 Yeas 28 - Nays 2 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Legislative Review of Rules for Maine's Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Title
An Act To Ensure Legislative Review of Rules for Maine's Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Rep. Kathleen Dillingham [R] | Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #724 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 724 Yeas 28 - Nays 2 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-07 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-503). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-04-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-503). |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-503) READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 7, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |