ME LD1781 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage New Major Investments in Shipbuilding Facilities and the Preservation of Jobs
Title
An Act To Encourage New Major Investments in Shipbuilding Facilities and the Preservation of Jobs
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer DeChant [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Sen. Michael Thibodeau [R] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #556 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #538 (Y: 117 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #538 (Y: 117 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville REQUESTED a Roll Call. Less than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was NOT ORDERED. |
2018-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-03-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-28 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-425) thereto. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-425) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-425) thereto ADOPTED |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln Senate Amendment "A" (S-425) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) READ |
2018-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 556 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-685). |
2018-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-685) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-03-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-03-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 538 (Yeas 117 - Nays 31 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2018-01-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2018-01-11 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |