ME LD1780 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Support Replacement of At-risk Home Heating Oil Tanks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Support Replacement of At-risk Home Heating Oil Tanks

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2020-02-25HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-25HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2020-02-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2020-02-20SenateREAD A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-678), in concurrence.
2020-02-20SenateCOMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
2020-02-18SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-678) READ and ADOPTED
2020-02-18SenateREAD ONCE
2020-02-18SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
2020-02-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2020-02-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-678).
2020-02-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2020-02-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-23SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-05-23HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback